+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor