+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor