+ − Actions (48)
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to concur in Senate amdmts. withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
- Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
- Motion withdrawn
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor