+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/16/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor