+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed