+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/19/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed