+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amended
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor