+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/14/2019
- Left pending in committee
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/26/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor