+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor