+ − Actions (20)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor