+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Correction in referral
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor