+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor