+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor