+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor