+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On November 12, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor