+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Vote reconsidered
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed