+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor