+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor