+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed