+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor