+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Postponed
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor