+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 19, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor