+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed