+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/22/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor