+ − Actions (62)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Rules suspended
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor