+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/9/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor