+ − Actions (52)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor