+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/23/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed