+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (88)
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Remarks ordered printed
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
- Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Corrected Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2021
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor