+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (72)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Comptroller
- Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Emergency Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
- Record vote
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor