+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor