+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor