+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed