+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor