+ − Actions (48)
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor