+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/14/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed