+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed