+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (87)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Government Organization
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On November 15, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor