+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Jurisprudence
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/15/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor