+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (107)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
- Motion withdrawn
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Motion to table fails
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (17)
King, Ken
Type:
Primary Sponsor