+ − Actions (80)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Justice
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Filed