+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/23/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor