+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor