+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/16/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/11/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor