+ − Actions (54)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed