+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/7/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor