+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Passed
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed