+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/11/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor