+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor