+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor